This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 19:40:12 (UTC).

Ryan Ramos vs. D.R. Horton, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 Ryan Ramos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D R Horton, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2091

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Ramos, Ryan

D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

D.R. Horton, Inc.

D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.

Ramos, Joe

as Doe 1

ROE 1

Jon Casey Construction, Inc.

Pacifica Coast Aluminum Products

ROE 2

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Ramos, Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, CARL L

Vo, Christina H.

Kott, Richard B.

Schick, Malcolm D.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Kott, Richard B.

 

Court Documents

Amendment filed

EX PARTE Amendment to Complaint; Comment: EX PARTE Amendment to Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: 3rd Cross-Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: on 2nd Cross-Complaint

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: D.R. Horton, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice.

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: to strike matters

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.; Ramos, Joe; Comment: with prejudice; Comment: (As to 2nd Cross-Complaint ONLY.)

Proof of Service

Ramos - Proof of Service.pdf; Comment: DEFECTIVE - Jon Casey Construction, Inc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in support of ex parte to continue trial

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of DD Horton Bay

Proof of Service

Proof of Service- Joe Ramos; Comment: Proof of Service- Joe Ramos

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: and Proof of Service

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.; Ramos, Joe; Comment: with prejudice; Comment: (As to 2nd Cross-Complaint ONLY.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice - defendant in 1st cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: D.R. Horton, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: to strike matters

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2016
  • Financial info for D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Financial: D.R. Horton Bay, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Joe: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-48198 Ramos, Joe $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Joe: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Financial: Ramos, Joe; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Ryan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-48439 Ramos, Ryan $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Ryan: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Ryan: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023761 Brown, Carl L $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial info for Ramos, Ryan: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial: Ramos, Ryan; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.