This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 22:56:55 (UTC).

RECLASSIFIED/Roy Welchvs.Kim Vu

Case Summary

On 11/17/2014 RECLASSIFIED/Roy Welchvs Kim Vu was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9507

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Welch, Roy

Defendants

Vu, Kim

Vu, Jeffrey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tryk, Benjamin P.

Law Offices Benjamin P. Tryk 7161 North Howard Street, Suite 204

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant Attorney

Smith, Shyla

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Pre

Order to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: reclassification from limited to unlimited

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stip and [Proposed} Order Granting Reclassification of Case

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Reclassify from Limited to Unlimited

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: for Jury Fees in the amount of $150.00 chk#09938

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

1553767_631NoticeofM; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Of Benjamin Azizian Regarding Proof of Electronic Service on Jeffrey Vu

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Association

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Comment: Order to Show Cause hearing on the Case Management Conference is set for 01/15/16 at 10:00am in dept. 401

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Reclassified From LTD Civil; Party Names: Welch, Roy; Vu, Kim; Vu, Jeffrey; Comment: Case Reclassified to Unlimited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Requested by both with an estimated time of 4-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Receipt filed- Comment: for Transfer of Documents received from Civil Unlimited Division

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: reclassification from limited to unlimited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stip and [Proposed} Order Granting Reclassification of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion- 1553767_631NoticeofM; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2016
  • Financial info for Vu, Kim: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00002204 Deutinger & Wells $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Financial info for Vu, Kim: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Financial: Vu, Kim; Total Financial Assessment $520.00; Total Payments and Credits $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-20161 Welch, Roy $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-14175 Welch, Roy $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: Transaction Assessment $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00030076 Tryk Law P.C. Operating Account $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Financial info for Welch, Roy: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Financial: Welch, Roy; Total Financial Assessment $180.00; Total Payments and Credits $180.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

Welch v. Vu, et al. 14CECL09507 .

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): a. Motor Vehicle b. General Negligence ยข. [ Intentional Tort d. [ Products Liability e f

. [ Premises Liability [ Other (specify):

11. Plaintiff has suffered

wage loss

. loss of use of property

hospital and medical expenses general damage

property damage

loss of earning capacity

other damage (specify):

All economic and non-economic damages known and unknown to Plaintiff at this time, but subject to proof at the time of trial; and pre-judgment interest.

@ ~0o0oo

12. [_] The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [___| listed in Attachment 12. b. [ as follows:

13. The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

14. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. (1) compensatory damages (2) [_] punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)):

(1) according to proof (2) [_] in the amount of: $

15. The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): All paragraphs of this complaint are alleged on information and belief. Date: March 7, 2017

Benjamin A. Azizian

{TYPE OR PRINT NAME)