This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 14:56:24 (UTC).

Rosemary Brace vs Jennifer Lewis

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 Rosemary Brace filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jennifer Lewis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3230

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brace, Rosemary

Respondent

Lewis, Jennifer Kristine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment MSA; Party Names: Brace, Rosemary; Lewis, Jennifer Kristine; Comment: Marital Status Terminates 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Documents sent to FLEX OAs for processing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default Shelf for Default w/Judgment Review (w/envelopes). File Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: as to respondent Jennifer Kristine Lewis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Judgment of Dissolution - Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment - Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution - Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Filed Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial info for Brace, Rosemary: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-39642 Brace, Rosemary $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial info for Brace, Rosemary: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial: Brace, Rosemary; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.