This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 17:05:45 (UTC).

Rosario Navarro vs. Ron Kinnersley

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 Rosario Navarro filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ron Kinnersley. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1931

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benavidez, Virginia

Navarro, Cesar

Navarro, Claudia

Navarro, Fausto

Navarro, Juan Carlos

Navarro, Rosario

by and through her Successor in Interest

Defendants

Navarro, Ruby

Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.

Kinnersley, Ron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Artigliere, William M.

Defendant Attorney

Moreno, Martin

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Navarro, Rosario; Navarro, Juan Carlos; Benavidez, Virginia; Navarro, Fausto; Navarro, Claudia; Navarro, Cesar; Kinnersley, Ron; Navarro, Ruby; Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition to Request for PDC - Roggs.pdf

Notice Filed

Ntc.WD.Req.Pretrial.Disc.Conf.pdf; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Request

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.

Notice of Settlement filed

Ntc.Settlement.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 5/1/17 at 1pm RM #104

Association of Attorney filed

Notice; Comment: Wilson Getty LLP

Proof of Service

POS.Navarro.Amended.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service - Amended (RUBY)

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Peremptory Challenge; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Ron Kinnersley

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Dismissal.Negligence.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement Filed

CMC.Stmt.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Navarro, Rosario; Navarro, Juan Carlos; Benavidez, Virginia; Navarro, Fausto; Navarro, Claudia; Navarro, Cesar; Kinnersley, Ron; Navarro, Ruby; Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to Negligence Cause of Action ONLY.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Pre Trial Discovery Conference- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: 11:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 5/1/17 at 1pm RM #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Ntc.Settlement.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- POS.Navarro.Amended.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service - Amended (RUBY)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial info for Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-30564 Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial info for Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial: Manning Gardens Care Center, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Kinnersley, Ron: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05011 Kinnersley, Ron $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Financial info for Kinnersley, Ron: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Financial: Kinnersley, Ron; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial info for Navarro, Cesar: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-25129 Navarro, Cesar $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial info for Navarro, Cesar: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial: Navarro, Cesar; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.