Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 15:06:15 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 06/10/2011 XXXXX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, M, Snauffer, Mark, Smith, Bruce, Ikeda, Dale and Smith, M. Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, M

Snauffer, Mark

Smith, Bruce

Ikeda, Dale

Smith, M. Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soto, Juan A

Petitioner

Herrera, Rosa

Defendants

Sierra Kings Health Care District

Sierra Kings Womens Health Center

Cano M.D., Miguel

Medina P.A., Julie

Sierra Kings District Hospital

Cano, Miguel, Medical Doctor

Medina, Julie

Bank of America, National Association

Minor

XXXXX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wagner, Nicholas

1111 East Herndon Suite 317 Wagner & Jones

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant Attorneys

Weiss, Andrew R.

Weiss, Martin, Salinas &Hearst 7108 N. Fresno Suite 250

Fresno, CA 93720

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Pelliconi, Bethany A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner cont from 8/31 - due to clerical error - case not set for this date lp petition to file late claim l

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner cont from 8/31 - due to clerical error - case not set for this date lp petition to file late claim l

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner cont from 8/31 - due to clerical error - case not set for this date lp petition to file late claim l

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Jury Trial- Original Type: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Original Type: Trial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Nicholas Wagner lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. le Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings Health Care District: Counter Payment Receipt # 172164 Sierra Kings Health Care District $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings Health Care District: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial: Sierra Kings Health Care District; Total Financial Assessment $360.00; Total Payments and Credits $360.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Counter Payment Receipt # 177865 Herrera, Rosa $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Counter Payment Receipt # 155607 Herrera, Rosa $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Counter Payment Receipt # 153599 Herrera, Rosa $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial info for Herrera, Rosa: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial: Herrera, Rosa; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XXXXX is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELLICONI BETHANY A.