This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:09:03 (UTC).

Ronald Story vs.Clovis Community Medical Center

Case Summary

On 08/18/2015 Ronald Story filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Clovis Community Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2619

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Story, Ronald

Defendants

Clovis Community Medical Center

Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor

Community Medical Centers Foundation as Doe 1

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center dba Clovis Community Medical Center

Valley Surgical Specialists

Hamilton, Nicholas, Medical Doctor

erroneously sued herein as Clovis Community Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gansen, Christopher J.

Defendant Attorneys

Jones, Jerry D.

White, William M.

Salinas, Richard S.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Dr. Bronk; Comment: Declaration of Dr. Bronk

Notice Filed

Exhibit A5 of ARL's Declaration; Comment: Exhibit A5 to Declaration of A. Leaf in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judicail Notice; Comment: in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Statement filed

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts; Comment: Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Nicholas Hamilton, MD

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No Proof of Mailing to the Parties Listed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury fees paid by Defendant Nocholas Hamilton, M.D.

Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Received

Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Received; Comment: Defendant Nicholas Hamilton, M.D.'s Answer to Complaint with monies check #13332 in the amount of $435.00 and check #13331 in the amount of $150.00

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Declaration Filed

Exhibit A3 of A. Leaf's Declaration; Comment: Exhibit A3 of A. Leaf's Declaration

Notice Filed

Exhibit A7 of ARL's Declaration; Comment: Exhibit A7 to Declaration of A. Leaf in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.

Notice Filed

Exhibit A2 of ARL's Declaration; Comment: Exhibit A2 to Declaration of A. Leaf in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Motion

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Nicholas Hamilton, MD

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stip.; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee M. Jacobson

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center dba Clovis Community Medical Center; Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor; Valley Surgical Specialists; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hamilton, Nicholas, Medical Doctor; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Community Medical Centers Foundation as Doe 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Abigal Leaf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Abigal Leaf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2016
  • Financial info for Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00015926 Jones, Jerry D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Financial info for Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00015925 Jones, Jerry D. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Financial info for Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Financial: Martin, Russell, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center dba Clovis Community Medical Center: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00032157 Eddings $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center dba Clovis Community Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Financial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center dba Clovis Community Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial info for Story, Ronald: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00018269 One Legal $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial info for Story, Ronald: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial: Story, Ronald; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.