This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:21:32 (UTC).

Ron Miller Enterprises Inc. vs. Lobel Financial Corporation/LEAD

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 Ron Miller Enterprises Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lobel Financial Corporation/LEAD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Simpson, Alan and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2661

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fresno Commercial Lenders Inc., a California Corporation

Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation

Fresno Commercial Lenders, Inc

Ron Miller Enterprises, Inc.

Defendants

Lobel Financial Corporation, a California Corporation

Bankers Insurance Company

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Chavez, Elizabeth

Guzman, Mario

King of Kars

Lobel Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor, D. Mitchell

Defendant Attorneys

Lobel, Gary D.

Green, Ronald J

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Tentative and Proposed Statement of Decision) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 7/24/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

Motion in Limine filed

Motion in Limine Filed; Comment: Motion in Limine #1

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment

Statement filed

Civil Document; Comment: Lobel Financial's separate statement of disputed material facts in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment

Untimely Peremptory Challenge

Untimely Peremptory Challenge; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service (Court of Appeal)

Amendment filed

Civil Document; Comment: Document: to Complaint Naming Doe; 1

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation Filed; Comment: to Correct Name of Plaintiff

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Order on Stipulation to Correct Name of Plaintiff; Stipulation to Correct Name of Plaintiff

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No. #6 (b) was Left Blank Incomplete form

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Bankers Insurance Company; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Chavez, Elizabeth; Guzman, Mario; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Refund disbursed and sent to department for approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Refund disbursed and sent to department for approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Refund disbursed and sent to department for approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Refund disbursed and sent to department for approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Completion of Transcript on Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing DCA F076205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Appeals Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Additonal Deposit for Clerk's Transcript: $508.00

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-01060 Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00010452 Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00008750 Taylor; D.; Mitchell $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00018935 Fresno Commercial Lenders Inc., a California Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial info for Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial: Ron Miller Enterprises Inc, a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $2,151.00; Total Payments and Credits $2,151.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.