This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:16 (UTC).

Roland Nelson vs. Stormy Prout/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Roland Nelson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Stormy Prout/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1537

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nelson, Roland

Defendant

Prout, Stormy

Others

All Other Occupants

DeLaCruz, Stormy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson, Roland

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE327537.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI Hearing scheduled for 02/24/14 . Clerk's judgment enter on 01/27/14. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff Roland Nelson against defendant Stormy Prout aka Stormy De La Cruz on 01/27/14 for restitution of the premises only 7140 N. Everest, Fresno, CA 93722. ***Copies placed in tickler under "N"*** lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Stormy Prout. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of does 1 through 10 defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: AMENDED Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Stormy Prout on 12/17/13. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2013
  • Proof of service-summon def.- Comment: Proof of service of summons on filed showing defective service on Stormy Prout . (#3 left blank ; #5 (a) left blank) sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: #3 and #5 (a) left blank on proof of service; #1 (c) on default left blank ; date left blank (copies in tickler N) sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 18-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE324030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 MM Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MMEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less