This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 20:22:55 (UTC).

Robynne L. Whetton vs. Bond Manufacturing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2014 Robynne L Whetton filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bond Manufacturing, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3197

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Whetton, Robynne Lee

Whetton, Matthew Gustav

Sears Holding Corporation

Schultz, Thomas

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bond Manufacturing, Inc.

Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation

Sears Holdings Corporation

Sears Holdings Management Corporartion

Bond Manufacturing, Inc., a California corporation

Orchard Supply Hardware, LLC

Lowes Companies, Inc.

Sears Holdings Management Corporation

Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation, a Corporation

Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation, a California corporation

Cross Defendant

Bond Manufacturing Inc, a Calif Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Panish, Brian J.

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 700 Panish, Shea & Boyle

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Allen, Jeffrey W.

Acquesta, Mary

OWENS, JOSEPH C

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Acquesta, Mary

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lowes Companies, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Objection filed

Objection filed; Comment: to requests for judicial notice in support of defendant Sears Holdings Corporation's motion for summary judgment

Opposition filed

Civil Document; Comment: to Sears Holdings Corporation's motion for summary judgment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Entry of Order

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice; Comment: in support for judicial notice in support of defendant sears holdings corporation's motion for summary judgment

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Notice of Motion by mail to Jennifer R. Thomas

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Returned: check #101078 $500.00; Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Separate Statement in Support of Summary Judgment; Request for Judicial Notice; Index of Exhibits; Declaration of Jennifer Thomas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Reason: Documents are being returned unprocessed. Please note effective July 1, 2016, documents filed by represented parties in all unlimited civil actions must be filed electronically. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Opposition filed

Opposition filed; Comment: to Defendant Sears HOldings Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Ex parte Filed

Ex parte Filed; Comment: for continuance of the hearing for defendant All Sears Holding Corporation's motion for summary judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in support of defendant sears holdings corporation's motion for summary judgment

Statement filed

Civil Document; Comment: Separate Statement in support of opposition to motion to compel

Statement filed

Civil Document

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Suggestion of Bankruptcy

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Whetton, Robynne Lee; Whetton, Matthew Gustav; Bond Manufacturing, Inc.; Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation; Sears Holdings Management Corporartion; Sears Holdings Corporation; Lowes Companies, Inc.; Orchard Supply Hardware, LLC; Schultz, Thomas; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (Last remaining active complaint; Entire Case now Dismissed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation, a California corporation; Bond Manufacturing, Inc., a California corporation; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Bond Manufacturing Inc, a Calif Corp; Orchard Supply Hardware Stores Corporation, a Corporation; Bond Manufacturing, Inc.; Sears Holdings Management Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (as to 1st Cross-Complaint ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Sears Holding Corporation; Bond Manufacturing, Inc.; Comment: Second Cross Complaint - without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sears Holdings Management Corporartion; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sears Holdings Management Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Orchard Supply Hardware, LLC; Comment: Without Prejudice as to Orchard Supply Hardware, LLC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lowes Companies, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- 30554 - rfd.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2014
  • Financial: Bond Manufacturing, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $930.00; Total Payments and Credits $930.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00007110 One Legal $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00006619 Sacramento Legal Support Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Counter Payment Receipt # 199688 Whetton, Robynne Lee $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Counter Payment Receipt # 195845 Whetton, Robynne Lee $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Financial info for Whetton, Robynne Lee: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Financial: Whetton, Robynne Lee; Total Financial Assessment $705.00; Total Payments and Credits $705.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Cross-Defendant asserts the following separate and distinct affirmative defenses:

1. AS A SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO THE CROSS-

COMPLAINT ON FILE HEREIN AND TO EACH ALLEGED CAUSE OF ACTION

CONTAINED THEREIN, this answering Cross-Defendant alleges that said Cross-Complaint fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against this answering Cross-Defendant.

2. AS A SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO THE CROSS-

COMPLAINT ON FILE HEREIN AND TO EACH ALLEGED CAUSE OF ACTION

CONTAINED THEREIN, this answering Cross-Defendant alleges that the Cross-Complainant, their agents, employees, servants and representatives were partially, if not wholly, negligent or otherwise at fault on their own part pursuant to the Doctrine of Comparative Negligence, and should be barred from recovery of that portion of the damages directly attributable to their proportionate share of the negligence or fault.

3. AS A SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO THE CROSS-

COMPLAINT ON FILE HEREIN AND TO EACH ALLEGED CAUSE OF ACTION

CONTAINED THEREIN, this answering Cross-Defendant alleges that the damages sustained by the Cross-Complainant, if any, were caused, in whole or in part, by the negligence or fault of others for which this answering Cross-Defendant is neither liable nor responsible.

4, AS A SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO THE CROSS-

COMPLAINT ON FILE HEREIN AND TO EACH ALLEGED CAUSE OF ACTION

CONTAINED THEREIN, this answering Cross-Defendant alleges that the Cross-Complainant has unreasonably delayed in bringing this action to the prejudice of this answe,ringl Cross-Defendant and is therefore barred from bringing this action by the Doctrine of Laches.

5. AS A SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO THE CROSS-

COMPLAINT ON FILE HEREIN AND TO EACH ALLEGED CAUSE OF ACTION

CONTAINED THEREIN, this answering Cross-Defendant alleges that the Cross-Complainant has acquiesced, has waived and is estopped, and barred from alleging the matters set forth in the Cross-

Complaint.

_ Page 2 BOND MANUFACTURING, INC.’S ANSWER TO ORCHARD SUPPLY HARDWARE STORES CORPORATION