This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:06:04 (UTC).

Roberto Guzman vs Calstar Industries, Inc./COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 11/17/2014 Roberto Guzman filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Calstar Industries, Inc /COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3621

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guzman, Roberto

Cabrera, Sabino

Diaz, Jose

Diaz, Dora

Diaz, Miguel Alejo

Lopez, Juan Carlos

Pena, Adelita

Manzo, Salvador

Rodriguez, Jose Manuel

Nebares, Leticia

Valdez, Antonio

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Calstar Industries, Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs

Moes 1-1000, Inclusive

Farris Grading and Paving, Inc.

Taylor Brothers, Inc.

Windows Plus, LLC

DC Brown C&P, Inc.

Western Insulation, L.P.

Abshire Electric

MDB Plastering, Inc.

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

King, Kenneth

Hartmann & Kananen 5743 Corsa Avenue Ste 119

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Braunstein, Carla N.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Nakagawa, Edwin S.

Meyer, Raymond, JR

Other Attorneys

Cano, Gino

Miller, Nathan S.

Gorman, Patrick J.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Lopez, Juan Carlos; Pena, Adelita; Rodriguez, Jose Manuel; Nebares, Leticia; Valdez, Antonio; Comment: Without Prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hi-Tech Roofing Services Co; Comment: Without Prejudice

Notice of Change of Address Filed

CASR 05847 NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS 072419.pdf

Order - Good Faith Settlement

Order - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: to toll five year statute of limitations prescribed by California Code of Civil Procedure Section 583.330. Trial dates set: Jury Trial - 3/23/2020 at 9 am in Dept. 502 Trial Readiness - 3/20/2020 at 9:30 am in Dept. 502 MSC - 2/5/2020 at 1:30 pm in Room 575

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 05.15.19** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Order for; Stipulation to Toll Five Year Statue of Limitations Prescribed by California Code of Civil Procedure SEction 583.330

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Complex fee paid by DC Brown C&P, Inc.

Letter Received

CASR 05847 LTR COURT RE COMPLEX FEES 050719.pdf; Comment: re: Complex fees paid by Cross-Defendant DC Brown C&P, Inc.

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Lopez, Juan Carlos; Pena, Adelita; Rodriguez, Jose Manuel; Nebares, Leticia; Valdez, Antonio; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hi-Tech Roofing Services Co; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (as to defendant in 1st Cross-Complaint, TAYLOR BROTHERS, INC. ONLY); Party Name: Taylor Brothers, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- CASR 05847 NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS 072419.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Good Faith Settlement- Order - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: to toll five year statute of limitations prescribed by California Code of Civil Procedure Section 583.330. Trial dates set: Jury Trial - 3/23/2020 at 9 am in Dept. 502 Trial Readiness - 3/20/2020 at 9:30 am in Dept. 502 MSC - 2/5/2020 at 1:30 pm in Room 575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Stipulation and Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 05.15.19** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Order for; Stipulation to Toll Five Year Statue of Limitations Prescribed by California Code of Civil Procedure SEction 583.330

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Complex fee paid by DC Brown C&P, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketFinancial info for Calstar Industries, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00014162 Sacramento Legal Support Inc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketFinancial info for Calstar Industries, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketFinancial: Calstar Industries, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00008748 King, Kenneth $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Counter Payment Receipt # 196977 Guzman, Roberto $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Counter Payment Receipt # 196976 Guzman, Roberto $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for Guzman, Roberto: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial: Guzman, Roberto; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP

Attomeys at Law 1401 WILLOW PASS ROAD, SUITE 700

CONCORD, CALIFORNIA 94520-7982 TELEPHONE 925 222 3400 ¢ Fax 925 356 8250

E-FILED

10/12/2017 12:45 PM

FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

By: C. Cogburn, Deputy

Mark J. D'Argenio (State Bar No. 238006) mdargenio@wshblaw.com

Carla N. Braunstein (State Bar No. 251198) cbraunstein@wshblaw.com

WooD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP 1401 Willow Pass Road, Suite 700 Concord, California 94520-7982

Phone; 925 222 3400 ¢ Fax: 925 356 8250

Attorneys for Defendant, CALSTAR INDUSTRIES, INC,

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR COUNTY OF FRESNO

ROBERT GUZMAN; SABINO CABRERA,; Case No. 14CECG03621 KCK JOSE & DORA DIAZ; MIGUEL ALEJO | DIAZ; JUAN CARLOS LOPEZ & ADELITA | SECOND AMENDMENT TO PENA; SALVADOR MANZO; JOSE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

MANUEL RODRIGUEZ & LETICIA SUBSTITUTING TRUE NAMES FOR

NEBARES; ANTONIO VALDEZ; ARTURO | FICTITIOUS NAMES & ROCIO MARTINEZ, [Assigned for All Purposes to Judge Kristi Culver Kapetan]

Plaintiffs, Action Filed: 6/25/15 V. Trial Date: | None Set CALSTAR INDUSTRIES, INC.; and DOES 1 through 1,000, inclusive,

Defendants.

COMES NOW Defendant and Cross-Complainant, CALSTAR INDUSTRIES, INC. (hereinafter "Cross-Complainant"), and amends its Cross-Complaint against Cross-Defendants, including MOES 1 through 1000, and each of them, as follows:

Cross-Complainant was unaware of the true names and capacities and liability of Cross- Defendants fictitiously identified as MOES 1 through 1000 in the original Cross-Complaint. Since the original Cross-Complaint was filed, Cross-Complainant has discovered the true names and identities of certain Cross-Defendants who were originally given fictitious names, and hereby

amends its Cross-Complaint to substitute such true names for such fictitious names, as follows:

LEGAL:10553-0055/8031757.1

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farris Grading and Paving, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor Brothers, Inc. is a litigant