This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/27/2018 at 13:09:57 (UTC).

Roberta Vallejo vs Frank Vallejo

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 Roberta Vallejo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Frank Vallejo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3226

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vallejo, Roberta Sue

Respondent

Vallejo, Frank Acosta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Arnold, Michael J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Pleading on Joinder-Ben Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Pleading on Joinder-Ben Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Pleading on Joinder-Ben Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Filed Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial info for Vallejo, Frank Acosta: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-55068 Vallejo, Frank Acosta $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial info for Vallejo, Frank Acosta: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial: Vallejo, Frank Acosta; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial info for Vallejo, Roberta Sue: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-39629 Vallejo, Roberta Sue $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial info for Vallejo, Roberta Sue: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial: Vallejo, Roberta Sue; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.