This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 13:34:10 (UTC).

Riverwalk Holdings v Priscilla Garcia/DIS

Case Summary

On 03/02/2012 Riverwalk Holdings filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Priscilla Garcia/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0255

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Riverwalk Holdings, LTD

Defendant

Garcia, Priscilla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Desai, Vijay S.

Defendant Attorney

Garcia, Priscilla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Dismissal not entered- Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: fee waiver was issued to defendant. Number 2 on dismissal needs to be marked along with page two completed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Case Management Conf Stmt- Comment: Case Management Conference Statement filed. jv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of Ruling filed. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/18/12 was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: CLOVIS, California on . Parties served: ALL PARTIES lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 18-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Order filed- Comment: Order that Requests for Admissions be Deemed Admitted and For Monetary Sanctions signed by Judge John J. Gallagher and filed. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1.) All requests for admissions in the First Set of Requests for Admissions be deemed admitted and for monetary sanctions as exhibit A, and served by Plaintiff, Riverwalk Holdings, Ltd., on Defendant Priscilla Garcia on 4/10/12, be deemed admitted. 2.) Defendant, Priscilla Garcia, pay a monetary sanction in the amount of $240.00 to Plaintiff, Riverwalk Holdings, Ltd., by payment to the Law Offices of Curtis O Barnes within 20 days of the date hereof. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Minute order Judge Gallagher- Comment: Dept. Clovis Judge: John J. Gallagher Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/16/54 Hearing: Motion Admissions Deemed Admitted Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Marlene Hubbell, Esq. - Special Appearance Defendant: Priscilla Garcia - Pro Per No Opposition filed Motion is granted IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1.) All requests for admissions in the First Set of Requests for Admissions be deemed admitted and for monetary sanctions as exhibit A, and served by Plaintiff, Riverwalk Holdings, Ltd., on Defendant Priscilla Garcia on 4/10/12, be deemed admitted. 2.) Defendant, Priscilla Garcia, pay a monetary sanction in the amount of $240.00 to Plaintiff, Riverwalk Holdings, Ltd., by payment to the Law Offices of Curtis O Barnes within 20 days of the date hereof. Service by the Clerk will constitute notice of the order. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 18-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2012
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to CCR Complaint filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Court Fees Waived- Comment: $225.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: Filing Fee of Answer cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Chenqi Gu filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. cg Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL38168.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . cm Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less