This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 17:51:13 (UTC).

Riverbend MHP LLC vs Andy Wood / UD Judgment

Case Summary

On 02/24/2012 Riverbend MHP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Andy Wood / UD Judgment. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County Sanger Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelley, James A, JR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kelley, James A, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Riverbend MHP LLC

Defendant

Wood, Andy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketOff calendar; Comment: Off calendar for Unlawful Detainer Dismissal Hearing scheduled for 06/01/12 at 10:30a.m. in Sanger. Court judgment entered 05/18/12 mn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketDefault Judgment by Court; Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) signed by Judge Kelley Jr. and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Riverbend MHP, LLC against Andy Wood in the amount of: Principal: $ 4533.00 Interest: $0.00 Attorney Fees: $500.00 costs: $290.00 Total: $5323.00 cg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forwarded to: Judge Kelley. cg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Case continued by Court to Date: June 1, 2012 Hearing- Set for: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal Time: 10:30am Dept: Sanger Court . Other : On the record KP Event: Case Continued-Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Cal Setting Printed; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-MAY-2012 by KPINON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketClerk Cert of Mailing Printed; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-MAY-2012 by KPINON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketMinute order Judge Kelley; Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Sanger Court Clerk: KPInon Tape: 10:27 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal Appearing Parties: PLFT: Riverbend MHP- Not Present PATY: Boyajian , Thomas appearing on behalf of Plaintiff DEFT: Wood, Andy - Not Present KP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketMinute order printed; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 11-MAY-2012 by KPINON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Riverbend MHP LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 8304 Riverbend MHP LLC $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Riverbend MHP LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: Riverbend MHP LLC; Total Financial Assessment $260.00; Total Payments and Credits $260.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-FEB-2012 by SSANTOS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 24-FEB-2012 by SSANTOS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of UD Dismissal Hrg; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 24-FEB-2012 by SSANTOS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLSA8304.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet sss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 sss Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverbend MHP LLC. is a litigant