This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 14:32:01 (UTC).

Richard Atkins vs. Billy Hendley

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 Richard Atkins filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Billy Hendley. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, McGuire, Rosemary, Diaz, Monica, Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan and Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1024

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

Diaz, Monica

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Atkins, Richard W.

Union Bank, N.A.

H & K, Inc.

as trustee of the Richard W. Atkins living trust of 2017

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Defendants

Hendley, Billy Ray

Hendley, Xuan Yu

Cross Defendants

as trustee of the Wanda Faye Atkins Grantor Trust, dated September 19, 2017

Hendley, Billy Raymond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hogue, David

Matayron, Nicolas

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Waller, Mark A.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: H & K, Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Union Bank

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons to Cross-Complaint filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons to Cross-Complaint filed

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: jury fees

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Cross-Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s Verified Answer to Defendant Billy Raymond Hendley's Verified Cross-Complaint

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Union Bank, N.A.; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross-Defendant)

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review; Comment: Type of Refund:Overpayment by Plaintiff

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Union Bank, N.A.; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties estimated time for trial is 2 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: OSC- Re: FTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Judge Patrick O'Hara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • Financial: Atkins, Richard W.; Total Financial Assessment $150.00; Total Payments and Credits $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Financial info for Hendley, Xuan Yu: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2018-01570 Hendley, Billy Ray $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Financial info for Hendley, Xuan Yu: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Financial: Hendley, Xuan Yu; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Financial info for Hendley, Billy Ray: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2018-01569 Hendley, Billy Ray $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Financial info for Hendley, Billy Ray: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Financial: Hendley, Billy Ray; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Financial info for Atkins, Richard W.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-21778 Atkins, Richard W. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Financial info for Atkins, Richard W.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Financial: Atkins, Richard W.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

DAVID M. HOGUE, #166009 MICHAEL G. KARBY, #179786

H & K, INC., ATTORNEYS AT LAW

POST OFFICE BOX 6

DINUBA, CALIFORNIA 93618 Telephone: (559) 591-3090

Fax: (559) 591-3614

Attorney for Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant:

E-FILED

5/22/2018 8:18 AM

FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

By: L Peterson, Deputy

RICHARD W. ATKINS

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO CENTRAL DIVISION

RICHARD W. ATKINS Plaintiff,

BILLY RAYMOND HENDLEY; XUAN YU-

HENDLEY, and DOES 1-10, inclusive, Defendant(s).

) CaseNo. 18CECG01024 3

) VERIFIED ANSWER OF

) RICHARD W. ATKINS TO

) CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION ) OF BOTH REAL AND PERSONAL ) PROPERTY BY SALE

PLAINTIFE’S VERIFICATION

[ am the Cross-Defendant in the above-entitled proceeding. I have read the foregoing VERIFIED ANSWER OF RICHARD W. ATKINS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF BOTH REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY BY SALE and verify that the facts alleged are true to the best of my knowledge. As to facts that are alleged based on information and belief, I believe them to be true.

[ declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the

foregoing is true and correct to the best of my knowledge and this document is executed on

March 15, 2018, in Dinuba, California.

RICHARD W. ATKINS