This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 05:14:57 (UTC).

Raymond Viveros vs. Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 Raymond Viveros filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body Paint. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2111

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viveros, Raymond

Defendant

Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint; Awarded Against:; Viveros, Raymond; Comment: Defendant Art Velasquez-Art s Auto Body+Paint does not owe plaintiff Raymond Viveros any money on plaintiff s claim.; Party Names: Viveros, Raymond; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Viveros, Raymond; Awarded Against:; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint; Amount; Damages: $8,000.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $8090.00; Party Names: Viveros, Raymond; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Vacate Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: Agreement reached.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint; Awarded Against:; Viveros, Raymond; Comment: Defendant Art Velasquez-Art s Auto Body+Paint does not owe plaintiff Raymond Viveros any money on plaintiff s claim.; Party Names: Viveros, Raymond; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Viveros, Raymond; Awarded Against:; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint; Amount; Damages: $8,000.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $8090.00; Party Names: Viveros, Raymond; Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Small Claims Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Order Vacating Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: by minute order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Motion to Vacate Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on January 19, 2017. Parties served: Raymond Viveros.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion- Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Vacate Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00001523 Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint $21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint: Transaction Assessment $21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00001515 Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint $0.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint: Transaction Assessment $0.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial: Art Velasquez-Art's Auto Body + Paint; Total Financial Assessment $21.10; Total Payments and Credits $21.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Viveros, Raymond: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031773 Viveros, Raymond $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Viveros, Raymond: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial: Viveros, Raymond; Total Financial Assessment $90.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less