This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:20:33 (UTC).

Ray Ornelas Jr. vs Kathy Olson

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Ray Ornelas Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kathy Olson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3893

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ornelas, Ray

Defendant

Olson, Kathy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arnold, Clayed C

Clayeo C. Arnold Corporation 865 Howe Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

Ornelas, Ray N., JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Document

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Ornelas, Ray; Olson, Kathy; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: Without Prejudice Entire Complaint Against Kathy Olson

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Ornelas, Ray; Olson, Kathy; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: Without Prejudice Entire Complaint Against Kathy Olson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Ornelas, Ray; Olson, Kathy; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M.Mendoza (jv) Reporter: Not recorded Nature of Hearing: 60-day Order to Show Cause -- Cont. to 04/09/2015 at 10 a.m. Dept. 401 for OSC Case to be dismissed if plaintiff fails to appear at next hearing. mgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185322.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: sg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Financial info for Ornelas, Ray: Counter Payment Receipt # 193257 Ornelas, Ray $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Financial info for Ornelas, Ray: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Ornelas, Ray: Counter Payment Receipt # 185322 Ornelas, Ray $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Ornelas, Ray: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial: Ornelas, Ray; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less