This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:29:25 (UTC).

Ravindrasihn G Saini vs Cera Jade Jules

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Ravindrasihn G Saini filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Cera Jade Jules. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6665

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saini, Ravindrasihn G

Respondent

Jules, Cera Jade

Minor

Jules-Saini, Aiyana Rina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Rusca, Christopher M

1327 N. Street

Fresno, CA 93721

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Documents sent to- Comment: sent copy of Judgment to FLEX for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Withdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Christopher Rusca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Copy of document filed- Comment: Copy of Notice of Registration of California Support Order (rec'vd from County of Madera) filed. djs 03/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date:8/5/14 Scanned Date: 9/10/14 ksr 9/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar. Judgment signed 8/5/14. 8/5/14 cv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Document sent to- Comment: Judgment signed 8/5/14. Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party. All other documents to be placed in runner box #40 for pick-up.. 8/5/14 cv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: outbox in Self-Help for scanning on 2nd Floor. 8/5/14 cv

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 17-DEC-2013 by DCALABRESE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 10/2013 to present dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__assigned to Judge Duncan dc 12/17/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Financial info for Jules, Cera Jade: Counter Payment Receipt # 224381 Jules, Cera Jade $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Financial info for Jules, Cera Jade: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Financial: Jules, Cera Jade; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Saini, Ravindrasihn G: Counter Payment Receipt # 215932 Saini, Ravindrasihn G $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Saini, Ravindrasihn G: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial: Saini, Ravindrasihn G; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less