This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 23:11:52 (UTC).

Qingxia Zhang vs. Shahram Emrany

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 Qingxia Zhang filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shahram Emrany. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Simpson, Alan, McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1873

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Simpson, Alan

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zhang, Qingxia

Defendants

Emrany, Shahram

Trustee of the Alexandre & Christiane Schenesson 2001 Trust

Scheinesson, Christiane

Lum, Michael Water

Eagle West Constractors

Nationwide Financial

Lee, Richard

Eagle Constructors

Lum, Michael Walter

Eagle Pacific Constructors

Nationalwide Financial

Scott, Donald Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tan, Kenny Kean

Defendant Attorneys

Folland, Brian N

D'Amato, Thomas J

Adams, Jon P.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Eagle West Constractors; Comment: Without prejudice

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

1850023_039ZhangvSch; Comment: Proof of Service for Case management Statement

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request For Dismissal

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: set aside default as to Donald Lee Scott

Case Management Statement Filed

1739912_556ZhangvSch; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

1692702_868Zhangv.Sc; Comment: Zhang v. Scheinesson -- Eagle West Con.-Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

1692702_530Zhangv.Sc; Comment: Zhang v. Scheinesson -- Lum-Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service

1692702_834Zhangv.sc; Comment: Donald Lee Scott

Case Management Statement Filed

3.19 Zhang II CMC Statement.pdf

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to Shahram Emrany - name in 6.a. incorrect

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Continued Case Management Conference

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for: Stip. to Set Aside Default

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Name of defendant does not match amendment filed on 06/08/2017

Proof of Service

1692702_885Zhangv.Sc; Comment: Christine Scheinesson

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

1615284_110ZhangvSch; Summons issued and filed

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Zhang, Qingxia; Emrany, Shahram; Lee, Richard; Lum, Michael Water; Scheinesson, Christiane; Eagle West Constractors; Lum, Michael Walter; Scott, Donald Lee; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lum, Michael Water; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Eagle West Constractors; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 3 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: ADR waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Entry.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • Financial info for Lee, Richard: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-52322 Lee, Richard $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Financial info for Lee, Richard: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Financial info for Lee, Richard: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-03116 Lee, Richard $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Financial info for Lee, Richard: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Financial: Lee, Richard; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Financial info for Zhang, Qingxia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-52845 Zhang, Qingxia $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Financial info for Zhang, Qingxia: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Financial info for Zhang, Qingxia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-28643 Zhang, Qingxia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Financial info for Zhang, Qingxia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Financial: Zhang, Qingxia; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF