This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 08:52:42 (UTC).

Progressive West Insurance vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 02/08/2011 Progressive West Insurance filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive West Insurance

Defendant

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lea, Michael R

Defendant Attorney

Padrick, John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Action dismissed (with ) prejudice. CM Event: Dismissed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Defendant filed answer 5-17-11 psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration pursuant to code of civil procedure section 585 filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: court judgment psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to Complaint filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Summons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on State of California by personal service on 04/15/11 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL33575.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.