This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 13:31:13 (UTC).

Precision Civil Eng Inc vs CALSTAR etal/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 02/23/2010 Precision Civil Eng Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALSTAR etal/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0408

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Precision Civil Engineering Inc

Defendant

CALSTAR Industries, Inc.

Others

Suhr, John D.

Creditors Bureau USA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: pro per New atty: John D Suhr for assignee of record Creditors Bureau USA ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • Assignment of judgment filed- Comment: Assignment of judgment filed assigning collection to Creditors Bureau USA ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 07/26/10 to both parties . jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 23-JUL-2010 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • Judgment for plaintiff- Comment: Court orders judgment entered on 07/22/10. Defendant CALSTAR Industries, Inc. shall pay plaintiff Precision Civil Engineering, Inc. $ 2,499.00 and $ 130.00 costs, total judgment $ 2,629.00 on plaintiff's claim. exd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Small Claims Minute Order- Comment: Temporary Judge: Joby Dupuis Dept.: 97E Clerk: E. Duque Reporter/Tape: 09/19/26 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Appearing parties: Plaintiff: Jamie Ohanesian - Office Manager Defendant: Wayne Moles - CEO Claim is for separate work done but, same relationship. Case will be consolidated with case number 10CESC00415. Court finds true name of Defendant is CALSTAR Industries, Inc. Judgment for Plaintiff. exd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Auth to Appear on Behalf Party- Comment: Authorization to Appear on behalf of CALSTAR Industries, Inc. filed by Wayne Moles on 07/22/10 exd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Auth to Appear on Behalf Party- Comment: Authorization to Appear on behalf of Precision Civil Engineering, Inc. filed by Jamie Ohanesian on 07/22/10. exd

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2010
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 21-JUL-2010 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court sub served as to Ms. Esper Martinez and filed. Cost $80.00 cr .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Court Trial- Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 08:45 AM; Result: Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service .Tracy Dobney cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • Reset hearing- Comment: Reset hearing of 5-4-10 to 7-22-10 at 8:45 in Dept 97E cr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt SCCE47499.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service .T. Dobney Box 7 cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Pltfs claim and order filed- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 5-4-10 at 8:45 in Dept #97E . cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Calstar Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Bureau USA is a litigant