This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:08 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs Toom Polsena/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Toom Polsena/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2136

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendants

Polsena, Toom

Polsena, Cindy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Toom Polsena and Cindy Polsena

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Toom Polsena and Cindy Polsena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of Judgment filed. Served on Cindy Polsena by mail on 08/25/14. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of Judgment filed. Served on Toom Polsena by mail on 08/25/14. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 7/18/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant(s) Toom Polsena and Cindy Polsena in the sum of: Principal: $1,660.60 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 0.00 Total: $1,660.60 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Toom Polsena and Cindy Polsena hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b) (2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of reasonable diligence filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Cindy Polsena on 1-15-14. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325626.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. JL Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: JL Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less