This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:18 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Nathan Seyler

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nathan Seyler. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2128

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Seyler, Nathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 9/16/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant Nathan Seyler in the sum of: Principal: $3,204.82 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 236.00 Total: $3,440.82 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Nathan Seyler hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Dismissal not entered- Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: does previously dismissed hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: compliance with ccp section 1033(b)(2), waiver of attorney fees, account purchase date filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b)(2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: No date of mailing at number 6 on request clerk judgment not processed hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Nathan Seyler on 1-10-14. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325517.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less