This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:20 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Maria Ceballos/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Ceballos/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2103

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Ceballos, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 5/16/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant Maria Ceballos in the sum of: Principal: $ 1,545.50 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $0.00 Costs: $ 236.00 Total: $1,781.50 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Maria Ceballos hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b) (2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Justin Ceballos, son, mailed on 1-27-14 mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325502.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less