Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:18:37 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs Lloyd E Beard III/CC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lloyd E Beard III/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2720

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendants

Beard III, Lloyd E

Beard, Lloyd E, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singh, Anita H

Hunt & Henriques 151 Bernal Rd. Ste. 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE312996.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 7/18/13 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant LLoyd E Beard III in the sum of: Principal: $3,286.21 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 284.00 Total: $3,570.21 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on for plaintiff(s) against defendant(s) in the sum of: Principal: $ Interest: $ Atty Fees: $ Costs: $ Total: $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of councel re: interest, costs, attorney fees filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Lloyd E Beard, III on 4-2-13 . ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE302128.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . dlm Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: dlm Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less