This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:25 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Josephine Gonzales/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Josephine Gonzales/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2102

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Gonzales, Josephine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of $0.00 Filed by Los Angeles Co. Writ of execution wholly unsatisfied $5295.93

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of $0.00 Filed by Los Angeles Co. Writ of execution wholly unsatisfied $5295.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE347876.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $ 4,780.93 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 5/16/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant Joephine Gonzales in the sum of: Principal: $4,519.93 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 236.00 Total: $4,755.933 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b) (2) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Josephine Gonzales hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Josephine Gonzales on 1/20/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325500.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less