This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:46 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Jimmy Avlers

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jimmy Avlers. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2122

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Avlers, Jimmy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 5/19/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant Jimmy Avlers in the sum of: Principal: $ 1,656.42 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 236.00 Total: $1,892.42 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Jimmy Avlers hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b) (2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/clerk's judgment sef

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jane Doe, mailed on 1-21-14 . ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325510.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. lmi Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 325510 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less