This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:20:56 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs Hector LLamas/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hector LLamas/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2133

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

LLamas, Hector

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of NON service filed - party Hector Llamas not served. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325617.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. JL Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: JL Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less