This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:24:48 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Desiree Mead/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Desiree Mead/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2099

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Mead, Desiree

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Imperial Amount: 2060.69

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: San Francisco Amount: $2060.69

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied- Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: San Francisco Amount: $2060.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Imperial Amount: 2060.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 9/16/14 for plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against defendant Desiree Mead in the sum of: Principal: $1,799.69 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 236.00 Total: $2,035.69 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Desiree Mead hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Dismissal not entered- Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: does previously dismissed hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: compliance with ccp section 1033(b)(2), waiver of attorney fees, account purchase date filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033(b) (2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00030446 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00012899 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2015
  • Financial: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less