This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:31 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. David H Kim/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David H Kim/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2105

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Kim, David H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Non Service filed for David H Kim. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325476.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 325476 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less