This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:10 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs. Chris Davenport/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chris Davenport/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2126

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendants

Davenport, Chris

Davenport, Regine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Portfolio Recovery Associates 120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of Request for Dismissal filed. Served on Chris Davenport by mail on 06-10-14. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed - party Regine Davenport not served. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Regine Davenport on 1-15-14. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Chris Davenport on 1-10-14. gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325515.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less