Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:17:55 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery vs Amber Peterson/CC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Portfolio Recovery filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amber Peterson/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2684

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Peterson, Amber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rundquist, Esq, Andrew

Legal Recovery Law Offices Inc 5030 Camino De La Siesta #340

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $175.00 Credit: $623.43 Interest: $829.46

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $5,317.13

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied- Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $5,317.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $175.00 Credit: $623.43 Interest: $829.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE351539.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Orange in the amount of $ 5,097.15 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 623.43 Interest: $ 699.48 Costs: $ 85.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Writ filed partially satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $137.21 ae

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. dlm Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of Venue filed. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: dlm Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00024772 Rundquist, Esq, Andrew $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00005122 Legal Recovery Law Offices $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Financial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Financial: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less