This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 15:53:10 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates vs Kamal Y Tannous/C

Case Summary

On 02/24/2010 Portfolio Recovery Associates filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kamal Y Tannous/C. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0319

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Tannous, Kamal Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pierce, Emily

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketOff calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 9-9-10 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketClerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 9-17-10 for plaintiff(s) Portfolio Recovery Associates against defendant(s) Kamal Y. Tannous in the sum of: Principal: $4945.07 Interest: $ 199.70 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 239.50 Total: $5384.27 psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed- Comment: Request for Default filed, Clerk's Judgment ER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Kamal Y. Tannous psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of custodian of records in support of request for judgment filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: request to enter default judgment ccp 585; copies in lieu of originals; interest filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration re compliance with ccp section 1033 (b) (2) filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Status Decl- Comment: Collection Case Status Declaration filed. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketSummons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Kamal Y Tannous by personal service on 05/15/10 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL29200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 05-MAR-2010 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce