This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 16:19:31 (UTC).

Peter Pierre vs. Misty Parker/UD

Case Summary

On 04/04/2011 Peter Pierre filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Misty Parker/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0435

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierr, Peter

Defendants

Parker, Misty

Stroud, James

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. als

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Misty Parker on 4-5-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 5-11-11 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL34506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Peter Pierre against defendant(s) Misty Parker, James Stroud on 4-15-11 for restitution of the premises only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Misty Parker & James Stroud psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to James Stroud psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on James Stroud on 4-4-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 07-APR-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL34336.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 04-APR-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leifer, William H.