This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 18:32:09 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 12/17/2015 XXXXX was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Dalesandro, Samuel and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3839

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dern, Kimberly

Dern, Peter

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

William, Fletcher

Harper, Julia Beth Ann

Trust, Kattie J

Fletcher, Kattie J

Fletcher, William A

Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust

Gagliardi, Vic

Verano, Elenita

Commercial California Real Estate

Verano, Eleneita

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Fletcher, Kattie J

Fletcher, William A

Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust

Gagliardi, Vic

Intervenors

psi, Administered by Risico Claims Management

City of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osier, Daniel L

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Ash, Paul V

Intervenor Attorney

Grijalva, Eric V

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 1/9/17 at 9am Room #104

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: First Amended Complaint

Letter Received

Letter Received

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Complaint in Intervention served on Julia Beth Ann Harper by personal service on 6/26/16

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint in Intervention; Comment: Complaint in Intervention

Answer Filed

Answer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 7-12 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: estimated time of 7-12 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • Financial: Fletcher, William A; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Financial info for Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-02392 Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Financial info for Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Financial info for Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Financial: Fletcher William & Kattie J. Trust; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Financial info for Dern, Peter: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00014209 Osier, Daniel L $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Financial info for Dern, Peter: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Financial info for Dern, Peter: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00034555 Osier, Daniel L $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Financial info for Dern, Peter: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Financial: Dern, Peter; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.