This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/09/2022 at 13:59:45 (UTC).

Pervaiz Chaudhry, Medical Doctor vs. The State of California

Case Summary

On 06/07/2016 Pervaiz Chaudhry, Medical Doctor filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against The State of California. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1852

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor

Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group

Respondent

The State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Leighton, Brian C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; The State of California; Comment: without prejudice

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Proof of Service

Petition - Writ of Mandate

Petition - Writ of Mandate; Comment: Pursuant to Government Code Section 946.6; Judicial Relief from Bar to Sue because of late presentation of Claim.

Notice Filed

Administrative Record; Comment: petitioners' lodging of the administrative record

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Adress or other Contact Information.

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; The State of California; Comment: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Adress or other Contact Information.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: petitioners' lodging of the administrative record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service on Summons and Writ Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00020862 Leighton; Brian; C. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Writ of Mandate; Comment: Pursuant to Government Code Section 946.6; Judicial Relief from Bar to Sue because of late presentation of Claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEIGHTON BRIAN CLAY