This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 12:53:04 (UTC).

Permanent General Assurance Corporation vs. KR Freightway Inc

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 Permanent General Assurance Corporation filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KR Freightway Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6159

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Permanent General Assurance Corporation

Defendants

Shorter, Leonard

KR Freightway Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mendelson, Lee M.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Permanent General Assurance Corporation; KR Freightway Inc; Shorter, Leonard; Comment: without prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc.

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Non-Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Non-Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date: 10/15/2018

Request for Dismissal

11/09/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

10/15/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Declaration

07/20/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/17/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/10/2018: Declaration

Declaration

06/28/2018: Declaration

Declaration

06/21/2018: Declaration

Notice of Hearing

06/18/2018: Notice of Hearing

Declaration

06/18/2018: Declaration

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Permanent General Assurance Corporation; KR Freightway Inc; Shorter, Leonard; Comment: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to KR Freightway Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Permanent General Assurance Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-44349 Permanent General Assurance Corporation $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Permanent General Assurance Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Permanent General Assurance Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date: 10/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: RE: Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

LEE M. MENDELSON, ESQ. (SBN 236819)

MARC A. SCHWARZ, ESQ. (SBN 292758) E-FILED

MENDELSON GOLDMAN & SCHWARZ

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION 6/18/2018 1:16 PM 5805 Sepulveda Blvd, Suite 850

Sherman QOaks, CA 91411 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Telephone: (818) 575-6822

Facsimile; (818) 703-7663 By: R. McCarley, Deputy

Refer to File No: 18000278

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO

( - Limited Civil) PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE) CASE NO.18CECL06159

CORPORATION )

; ) COMPLAINT FOR MONEY Plaintiff(s),

Subrogation Claim Indebtedness

KR FREIGHTWAY INC; LEONARD SHORTER; DOES 1 - 100,

DEMAND ($6,031.04) Defendant(s).

Plaintiff complains and alleges as follows:

GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

1. At all times mentioned herein, Plaintiffcorporation, duly organized and

existing under and by virtue of the laws of the state of its incorporation.

2. The true names and capacities of Defendants, DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, are unknown to

Plaintiff at this time, who therefore sues said Defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff is informed

and believes and thereon alleges that each defendant named as a Doe is responsible for each and every

obligation hereinafter set forth.

3. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and thereon alleges, that each defendant named in this

3. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and thereon alleges, that each defendant named in this complaint was at all times herein mentioned, and now is, the agent and employee of each of the other Defendants herein, and was at all such times acting within the course and scope of said agency and employment.

complaint was at all times herein mentioned, and now is, the agent and employee of each of the other Defendants herein, and was at all such times acting within the course and scope of said agency and employment.

4, Plaintiff alleges that the defendants, or some of them, reside and / or have a principle place

of business in the above-cited Judicial District.

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Subrogation Claim)

5. Plaintiff refers to paragraphs 1 - 4, inclusive, of its General Allegations, and by this reference incorporates the same herein as though fully set forth.

6. PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION (hereinafter referred to as "Plaintiff"), is a corporation doing business in the various state in the United States, including the State of California, being qualified and certified to do business in the State of California, and is engaged in the business of providing insurance, among other things.

7. KR FREIGHTWAY INC and LEONARD SHORTER (hereinafter referred to as "Defendant™) have a principal place of business located at 901 Harold Street #172, Kingsburg, CA 93631.

8. On or about October 16, 2017, the Plaintiff had in effect an insurance policy with COLIBRI ROBERTS (hereinafter referred to as "Insured") providing automobile insurance.

0. At the time mentioned hereinabove, LEONARD SHORTER was driving vehicle owned by and within the scope of employment with KR FREIGHTWAY INC. At said time, LEONARD SHORTER’s trailer collided into the insured’s vehicle when LEONARD SHORTER was making a right turn.

10. Asadirect and proximate cause of Defendant's negligence described above, the Plaintiff made payments under the Insured's policy for the repair of the property and other expenses in the sum of $6,031.04.

11. Wherefore, Plaintiff demands a judgment against the Defendant in the sum of $6,031.04.

SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION

(Indebtedness) 12. Plaintiff refers to paragraphs 1 - 4, inclusive, of its General Allegations, and by this reference incorporates the same herein as though fully set forth.

13, Defendants, and each of them, are indebted to Plaintiff in the sum of $6,031.04

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff prays Judgment against Defendants, and each of them, as follows: AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION: L For the principal sum of $6,031.04; AS TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION: 2. For the principal sum of $6,031.04; AS TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION:

3. For costs of suit incurred herein; 4. For such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper; DATED: June &, 2019 MENDELSON GOLDMAN & SCHWARZ, APC

vv‘/

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K R FREIGHTWAY INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL