This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 22:20:12 (UTC).

Pedro Longoria vs.Adventist Medical Center Selma

Case Summary

On 07/21/2016 Pedro Longoria filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Adventist Medical Center Selma. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2333

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Longoria, Pedro

Longoria, Melissa

Defendants

Masseaux, Joy, Medical Doctor

Adventist Medical Center Selma

Saavedra, Jeffrey, Medical Doctor

Clovis Community Medical Center

Bhandry, Pramode, Medical Doctor

Bhandary, Pramode, Medical Doctor

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baradat, Daniel R.

Defendant Attorneys

LOGAN, GARY L

White, William M.

Ball, Michael F.

Paloutzian, Dirk B.

Lozada, Alex A.

Salinas, Richard S.

 

Court Documents

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First amended answer

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees for Joy Masseaux, M.D.

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Jeffrey Saavedra MD

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order to File First Amended Answer; Comment: Forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 2/21/17. Forwarded to Dept 501 Stipulation and Order to File First Amended Answer

Statement filed

Statement of Evidence; Comment: Statement of Evidence

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: by Pramode Bhandary, M.D.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Jeffrey Saavedra's Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Adventist Medical Center Selma; Comment: Without Prejudice as to Defendant Adventist Medical Center-Selma only

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: DEFENDANT, JEFFREY SAAVEDRA, M.D.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION BRIEF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Community Medical Center

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fees paid for Defendant Jeffrey Saavedra, M.D.

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Masseaux, Joy, Medical Doctor; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to defendant, Joy Masseaux, M.D., ONLY in exchange for a waiver of costs.)

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Fees paid by Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, dba Clovis Community Medical Center

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Intent to Introduce Entire Unedited Video Testimony in Evidence at Trial - Chris Perkins

Statement filed

Statement of Evidence; Comment: Jeffrey Saavedra's Statement of Evidence

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Masseaux, Joy, Medical Doctor; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to defendant, Joy Masseaux, M.D., ONLY in exchange for a waiver of costs.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Adventist Medical Center Selma; Comment: Without Prejudice as to Defendant Adventist Medical Center-Selma only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 7-15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Dirk Paloutzian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement; Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion- Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion of Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • Financial info for Masseaux, Joy, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Financial: Masseaux, Joy, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center Selma: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53433 Adventist Medical Center Selma $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center Selma: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center Selma: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-42167 Adventist Medical Center Selma $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center Selma: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Financial: Adventist Medical Center Selma; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial info for Longoria, Pedro: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-31008 Longoria, Pedro $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial info for Longoria, Pedro: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial: Longoria, Pedro; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.