This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 08:39:00 (UTC).

Peach-Drown vs. Williams/JU

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 Peach-Drown filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Williams/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0795

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peach-Drown LLC

Defendant

Williams, Lakeetha

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coronado, Louie

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Lakeetha

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 26-MAR-2013 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) signed by Judge Dale Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Peach-Drown LLC against Lakeetha Williams in the amount of: Past-due rent: $ 875.00 Holdover damages: $ 267.00 Attorney Fees: $ 375.00 Costs: $ 305.00 Total: $ 1822.00 The lease is forfeited. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J. Verbera/jp Reporter: 2:34:00 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Louie Coronado is present on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendant is not present. Attorney Louie Coronado is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial notice of the rental agreement, 3-day6 notice and Proof of Service already in the court file. Order is signed on the record. Notice waived. Money damages Granted. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money Damages on 03-25-13 at 2:00p.m. in dept #401. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 28-FEB-2013 by CDUNCAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Returned Mail from Court- Comment: Notice mailed by court returned by Post Office with forwarding address. Notice re-mailed Name and New Address: Lakeetha Williams 1431 E. Fremont Ave Fresno, CA 93710 cd 2-28-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 14-SEP-2012 by RALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Lakeetha Williams on 08/06/12. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Proof of svc on prejudge claim- Comment: Proof of service on Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed, served on 08/06/12. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting Publication signed by Judge on . nm/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 03-AUG-2012 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL39815.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less