This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 15:34:14 (UTC).

Paula Overson vs Michael Overson

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 Paula Overson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michael Overson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Zepeda, Francine, Mangano, Robert and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3313

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Zepeda, Francine

Mangano, Robert

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Overson, Paula A

Respondent

Overson, Michael A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Schreiber, Lenore

Hunt, Gary A.

Respondent Attorneys

Stegall, Nancy J

Amador, Catherine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketModification OSC/Motion- Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Adult child support per Attorney Petrini via phone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketOrder after Hearing- Comment: for 11/20/2019 hearing signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: sent OAH to Dept 202 for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Accepted Pending Judge's Review/Signature - OAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: HRG:11/20/2019 Time: 3:51PM Dept: 202 Judge: D Kalemkarian Clerk: L. Garvin Reporter:T.Alison Petitioner: Present/ Sworn/ Counsel: Hunt Respondent: Present/ COunsel: Amador Hearing Type: Settlement Conference Other: The Court met with counsel in chambers. Agreement reached. The parties have previously reached agreements and are in written form. The 1968 Camaro and Harley Davidson shall be sold via a broker and proceeds equally divided. The 2002 Holiday Rambler RV is assigned to Petitioner. When sold, proceeds 100% to Petitioner. Petitioner to change title to her name only by 12/15/2019. Respondent to continue making spousal support payments to Petitioner in the amount of $900.00 per month until payment from Respondent's pension commences. The Court reserves jurisdiction over the issues of spousal support and child support for adult child with special needs. Date of marriage: 11/7/1986. Date of separation: 6/11/2018. The parties to submit a stipulation to department 202 regarding the 401K for the Court to sign. The parties agree to the division of property as stated on the record. JUDGMENT: Court finds: This is an uncontested dissolution of marriage. The Court makes the following findings: Irreconcilable differences have arisen causing a complete and irremediable breakdown of the marriage such that no period of counseling or waiting would help restore the marital relationship. Parties waive rights to notice of trial, written statement of decision, right to move for a new trial and right to appeal. Petitioner's former name is not restored. Judgment granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 7/5/2018 by filing of the Response. Judgment effective upon date of filing. Attorney Hunt to prepare and submit the judgment for filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Overson, Michael A: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-91981 Overson, Michael A $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Overson, Michael A: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Overson, Michael A: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Overson, Michael A; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketResponse- Comment: for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Overson, Paula A: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-41386 Overson, Paula A $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Overson, Paula A: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Overson, Paula A; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.