This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 14:05:10 (UTC).

Patricia Brock vs. Patrick Sabelhaus

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 Patricia Brock filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Patrick Sabelhaus. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2686

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brock, Patricia

Defendants

Larrea, Jose

Carolyn Anderson/The Village at Kings Canyon

Sabelhaus, Patrick R

The Village at Kings Canyon, LP

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Brock, Patricia; Awarded Against:; Carolyn Anderson/The Village at Kings Canyon; Larrea, Jose; The Village at Kings Canyon, LP; Amount; Damages: $1,200.00; Costs: $235.00; Total: $1435.00; Comment: Costs of $235 ($75 to be paid back to the Courts, $160 to FSO for fees waived) Statement of Decision: Judgment for Plaintiff for $1200 PLUS all court costs of $235 ($75 to be paid back to the courts, $160 to sheriff s office for fees waived) to be paid by the Defendants. The Plaintiff presented credible evidence in her oral testimony and demonstrative evidence that she had $1200 of personal property damage caused by the Defendants and their lack of supervision and/or notification to the Plaintiff during repairs to her apartment. Defendant presented credible evidence that the amount of the Plaintiff's out of pocket rent during the month of repairs for $310 was not charged. The Plaintiff's complaint of privacy violation, harassment and discrimination were not addressed by this Court without any claim or issue preclusion on these matters. Oral evidence was presented in Court that there was a pending "fair housing" claim with a governmental entity. Plaintiff's complaints of privacy violation, harassment and discrimination are untimely, and the Plaintiff needs to exhaust administrative remedies before this Court can decide these privacy, harassment and discrimination issues. Plaintiff prevailed on property damage claims.; Party Names: Brock, Patricia; Carolyn Anderson/The Village at Kings Canyon; Larrea, Jose; The Village at Kings Canyon, LP

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Letter addressed to presiding judge

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Order on Request to Correct or cancel judgment ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 06/07/2017 ) . Parties served: ( Plaintiff )

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer (Hold until 03/30/17)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Eric Kjeldgaard, Exec Dir.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 1st continuance at counter for service of 1st amended claim

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 04/14/20147 ) . Parties served: ( All Parties )

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Comment: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Answer to Request for Court Order file

Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Jose Larrea

Answer to Request for Court Order file

Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Eric D. Kjeldgaard/ The Village at Kings Canyon, LP

Answer to Request for Court Order file

Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Carolyn Anderson

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 03/17/2017 ) . Parties served: ( Defendant's )

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Brock, Patricia; Awarded Against:; Carolyn Anderson/The Village at Kings Canyon; Larrea, Jose; The Village at Kings Canyon, LP; Amount; Damages: $1,200.00; Costs: $235.00; Total: $1435.00; Comment: Costs of $235 ($75 to be paid back to the Courts, $160 to FSO for fees waived) Statement of Decision: Judgment for Plaintiff for $1200 PLUS all court costs of $235 ($75 to be paid back to the courts, $160 to sheriff s office for fees waived) to be paid by the Defendants. The Plaintiff presented credible evidence in her oral testimony and demonstrative evidence that she had $1200 of personal property damage caused by the Defendants and their lack of supervision and/or notification to the Plaintiff during repairs to her apartment. Defendant presented credible evidence that the amount of the Plaintiff's out of pocket rent during the month of repairs for $310 was not charged. The Plaintiff's complaint of privacy violation, harassment and discrimination were not addressed by this Court without any claim or issue preclusion on these matters. Oral evidence was presented in Court that there was a pending "fair housing" claim with a governmental entity. Plaintiff's complaints of privacy violation, harassment and discrimination are untimely, and the Plaintiff needs to exhaust administrative remedies before this Court can decide these privacy, harassment and discrimination issues. Plaintiff prevailed on property damage claims.; Party Names: Brock, Patricia; Carolyn Anderson/The Village at Kings Canyon; Larrea, Jose; The Village at Kings Canyon, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sabelhaus, Patrick R; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: Letter addressed to presiding judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Order on Request to Correct or cancel judgment ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 06/07/2017 ) . Parties served: ( Plaintiff )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 04/14/20147 ) . Parties served: ( All Parties )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denied- Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Comment: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Request for Court Order file- Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Jose Larrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Request for Court Order file- Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Eric D. Kjeldgaard/ The Village at Kings Canyon, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Request for Court Order file- Answer to Request for Court Order file; Comment: Answer filed by Carolyn Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 03/17/2017 ) . Parties served: ( Defendant's )

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00019640 Brock, Patricia $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00041369 Brock, Patricia $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Transaction Assessment $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Fee Waiver $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Brock, Patricia: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial: Brock, Patricia; Total Financial Assessment $79.00; Total Payments and Credits $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.