This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 23:10:09 (UTC).

Pat Desantis vs. Rayan Aubuchon/UD

Case Summary

On 08/08/2011 Pat Desantis filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rayan Aubuchon/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0954

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Desantis, Pat

Defendants

Aubuchon, Ryan

Tracy, Tiffany

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hubbell, Marlene A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2011
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Fain on 11/05/11 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of plaintiff Pat Desantis against defendants(s) Ryan Aubuchon; Tiffany Tracy in the sum of: Principal: $3,500.00 Interest: $2,650.00 Atty Fees: $400.00 Costs: $275.00 Total: $6,825.00 Order signed in open court. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 11:32:35 Nature of Hearing: Default Hearing vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-OCT-2011 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Default Hearing- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Tiffany Tracy, mailed on 09/03/11 . sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Ryan Aubuchon on 09/03/11 sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 09/21/11. default filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Ryan Aubuchon, Tiffany Tracy and All other Occupants. sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • Proof of svc on prejudge claim- Comment: Proof of service on Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed, served on all occupant by positng and mailed on 09/03/11 . sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 09-AUG-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL35852.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 08-AUG-2011 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.