Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 22:30:54 (UTC).

Paramount Orchards vs Ballantine Produce/Judgment

Case Summary

On 04/19/2010 Paramount Orchards filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ballantine Produce/Judgment. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald and Alvarez, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1377

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Alvarez, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC

Defendant

Ballantine Produce Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gundy, Christopher Van

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Court judgment- Comment: Witnesses sworn, exhibits filed. Court orders judgment for Plaintiff Paramount Orcharsds against Defendant Ballantine Produce Company, Inc. in the sum of: Principal: $ 30,164.00 Interest: $ 3,338.00 Costs: $ 3,758.00 Attorney fees: $ 355.00 Total: $ 37,615.00 gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued OSC; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 09:01 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for OSC scheduled for 2/23/11 . Vacated per order dated 2/16/11 kl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Order filed- Comment: Order to vacate the Order to Show Cause haring set 2-24-11 signed by Judge Donald Black filed. skp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of application and order to continue or vacate order to show cause hearing regarding case management conference filed. Served on CT Corporation, Ballantine Produce Co., Wild, Carter & Tipton by mail on 2-16-11 . (GAC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CVCE149469.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • CMC continuance order- Comment: Application / Request and order for continuance of Case Management Conference, sent to Dept. #502 gs Order signed and forwarded to clerk's office for further processing. Order granted to vacate Order to Show Cause on Case Management Conference. nl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued OSC; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Brian; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 30-DEC-2010 by SPALMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$355.00 was made on receipt CVCE138652.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: csp Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Financial info for Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 149469 Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Financial info for Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Financial info for Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 138652 Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Financial info for Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC: Transaction Assessment $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Financial: Paramount Orchards partners VI, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $375.00; Total Payments and Credits $375.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNDY, CHRISTOPHER VAN