This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 22:51:26 (UTC).

Pacific Service Credit Union vs Matthew Fry

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Pacific Service Credit Union against Matthew Fry in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2121

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Service Credit Union

Defendant

Fry, Matthew S

 

Court Documents

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: section # 1.a. is incomplete

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Line # 1.a. does not match complaint. (No action taken on Clerk's judgment as Default was denied, also Clerk is not authorized to grant Judgment on according to proof attorney fees and line # 2.a. does not match prayer in complaint, party must apply for court judgment)

Proof of Service

fry, matthew proof of service sub service.pdf; Comment: Matthew S Fry

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

Summons issued and filed

fry summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

fry summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Declaration Filed

fry venue decl.pdf; Comment: re Venue

Civil Complaint filed

fry complaint.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

fry civil cover.pdf

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Pacific Service Credit Union; Fry, Matthew S; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Pacific Service Credit Union; Awarded Against:; Fry, Matthew S; Amount; Damages: $32,837.74; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 7.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,333.58; Attorney Fees: $2,991.89; Costs: $550.00; Total: $37713.21

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

FRY DEFAULT COURT.pdf

Request for Court Judgment

FRY COURT JUDGMENT.pdf; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 10.22.18** Forwarded to R.A. on 10/9/2018

Request for Default Received

FRY DEFAULT CLERK.pdf

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Item # 1.a. not answered.

Request for Default Received

FRY DEFAULT CLERK.pdf; Comment: With Judgment

Declaration Filed

FRY DECL ATTY FEES.pdf; Comment: Re Attorney Fees

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Clerk's judgment not entered as Default was denied, also Clerk is not authorized to grant Judgment on according to proof attorney fees and line # 2.a. does not match prayer in complaint, party must apply for court judgment.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Pacific Service Credit Union; Fry, Matthew S; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Pacific Service Credit Union; Awarded Against:; Fry, Matthew S; Amount; Damages: $32,837.74; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 7.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,333.58; Attorney Fees: $2,991.89; Costs: $550.00; Total: $37713.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- FRY WRIT.pdf; Comment: County: San Francisco Amount: $37,738.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- FRY ABSTRACT.pdf; Comment: Amount: $37,713.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- FRY DEFAULT COURT.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- FRY COURT JUDGMENT.pdf; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 10.22.18** Forwarded to R.A. on 10/9/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- fry summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- fry venue decl.pdf; Comment: re Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- fry complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- fry civil cover.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Financial info for Pacific Service Credit Union: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-82374 Pacific Service Credit Union $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Financial info for Pacific Service Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Financial info for Pacific Service Credit Union: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-43308 PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNION $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Financial info for Pacific Service Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Financial: Pacific Service Credit Union; Total Financial Assessment $485.00; Total Payments and Credits $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SHORT TITLE: PSCU V FRY et al

4. (Continued)

PLD-C-001

CASE NUMBER:

b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [ Doe defendants (sp

ecify Doe numbers). e were the agents or employees of the named

defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) () Doe defendants (sp plaintiff.

ecify Doe numbers): . arepersons whose capacities are unknown to

c. [ information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are(names).

5. [ Plaintiff is required to comply

with a claims statute,and

a. [] has complied with applicable claims statutes,or b. [ is excused from complying because (specify) :

6. This action is subjectto [X] Civil Code section 1812.10 [} Civil Code section 2984.4.

7 This court is the proper court because

@ ™0 a0 T

[ other (specify)

[] a defendant entered into the contract here.

[} a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

[X] a defendant lives here now.

[} the contract was to be performed here.

(] adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. (] real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or

more causes of action attached): [X] Breach of Contract

X} Common Counts

(] Other (specify) :

9. [] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit: for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [X} damages of: § 23,511.00

h. [X] interest on the damages

(1) [ according to proof

2) (X1 at the rate of c. [X] attorney's fees

(1) LAof$

(specify): 8.9 percent peryear from (date): 4-1-18

2) (X1 according to proof. d. [X] other (specify) : 3RD AND 4TH CAUSES OF ACTION IN THE SUM OF 9326.68 TOGETHER WITH INTEREST AT THE RATE PF 7.99% FROM APRIL 27, 2018 11. L] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers)

Date: 4-26-2018

TROY M WILKTINSON _______

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007}

CER' | Essential cebIEoBm FJ!’Q'_“E