This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:06:57 (UTC).

Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company vs. Michael Young

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Young. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Diaz, Monica, Snauffer, Mark, Black, Donald, McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9452

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

Black, Donald

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company

Defendants

Old Dominiom Freight Line Inc.

Young, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark R

Defendant Attorney

O'Neal, Jeffrey F.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Sub Attys.ODFL.Pac.pdf; Comment: Substitution of Attorney on behalf of Old Dominnion Freight Line, Inc. only

Substitution of Attorney Filed

DOC042618-001.pdf; Comment: Old Attorney: Jeffrey F. Oneal New Attorney: Jeffrey F Oneal

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stip Re ADR.pdf; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

Notice Filed

DOC022618-003.pdf; Comment: Defs. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Michael Young's Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

DOC022618-002.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement On Behalf of Defendants Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Michael Young

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Michael Young

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment Received

Judgment.PacPion.pdf; Comment: Jury Verdict

Declaration Filed

List of Proposed Jury Instructions; Comment: List of Proposed Jury Instructions

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

DOC020218-002.pdf; Comment: Notice oif Change of Handling Attorney

Answer Filed

DOC011918-002.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC Hearing

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Statement of Damages

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment on Jury Verdict; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Judgment on Jury Verdict; Party Names: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company; Young, Michael; Old Dominiom Freight Line Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Young, Michael; Old Dominiom Freight Line Inc.; Awarded Against:; Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company; Comment: Defendants shall recover costs from plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Total Costs: $1,142.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Not Entry Jdgmt.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment Upon Jury Verdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept:403 Order for: Judgment upon jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment.PacPion.pdf; Comment: Jury Verdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Exhibit List Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Day 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Jury Instructions- Jury Instructions; Comment: Given

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Special Verdict filed- Special Verdict filed

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • Financial info for Young, Michael: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-16372 Young, Michael $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Financial info for Young, Michael: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Financial info for Young, Michael: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2018-00453 Young, Michael $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Financial info for Young, Michael: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Financial: Young, Michael; Total Financial Assessment $865.40; Total Payments and Credits $865.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Financial info for Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00004489 WWOT INC $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Financial info for Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Financial info for Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-66262 Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Financial info for Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Financial: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $372.50; Total Payments and Credits $372.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.