This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 23:57:42 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Olga Chavez Escamilla

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Olga Chavez Escamilla. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1758

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oportun Inc.

Progress Financial Corp.

Defendant

Chavez Escamilla, Olga Lilia

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against:; Chavez Escamilla, Olga Lilia; Amount; Damages: $1,085.19; Costs: $160.00; Total: $1245.19; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Chavez Escamilla, Olga Lilia

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Linda Lara

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Diana Chavarria, Collection Agent

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: continued in court

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against:; Chavez Escamilla, Olga Lilia; Amount; Damages: $1,085.19; Costs: $160.00; Total: $1245.19; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Chavez Escamilla, Olga Lilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Linda Lara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Continued Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Diana Chavarria, Collection Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: continued in court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 08/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00027718 Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.