This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 12:30:41 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Fidel Vega

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fidel Vega. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Diaz, Monica and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0580

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oportun Inc.

Progress Financial Corp.

Defendant

Vega, Fidel

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's claim and Order filed

Plaintiffs Claim

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Fidel Vega

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance for hearing from court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Cynthia Salinas

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Donna Flores

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against:; Vega, Fidel; Amount; Damages: $2,217.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $2322.00; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Vega, Fidel

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against:; Vega, Fidel; Amount; Damages: $2,217.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $2322.00; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Vega, Fidel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Donna Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Cynthia Salinas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance for hearing from court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Fidel Vega

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's claim and Order filed- Plaintiffs Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2018-00005618 Oportun Inc. $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Transaction Assessment $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-17434 Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $102.00; Total Payments and Credits $102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant