This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 12:20:44 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Amanda Amaral

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amanda Amaral. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0542

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oportun Inc.

Progress Financial Corp.

Defendant

Amaral, Amanda

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's claim and Order filed

Plaintiffs Claim

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Jennifer Peralta

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Amaral, Amanda; Comment: Without prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Amaral, Amanda; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Jennifer Peralta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's claim and Order filed- Plaintiffs Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-17319 Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant