This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 12:20:51 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Amalia Hernandez

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amalia Hernandez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0543

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oportun Inc.

Progress Financial Corp.

Defendant

Hernandez, Amalia Esparza

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Hernandez, Amalia Esparza; Comment: Without Prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amalia Esparza Hernandez

Plaintiff's claim and Order filed

Plaintiffs Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Oportun Inc.; Hernandez, Amalia Esparza; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Amalia Esparza Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's claim and Order filed- Plaintiffs Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-17325 Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant