This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 14:58:03 (UTC).

Omega Dedicated Limited vs. Robert Cookston, III

Case Summary

On 11/30/2016 Omega Dedicated Limited filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Robert Cookston, III. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3850

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Chaucer Corporate Capital

Omega Dedicated Limited

on behalf of Certain Underwriters Subscribin to Master Policy No. 33006510

(No3) on behalf of Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Master Policy No. 33006512 and Master Policy No. 13CBA1330

on behalf of Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Master Policy No. 33006510

Chaucer Corporate Capital (No3)

on behalf of Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Master Policy No. 33006512 and Master Policy No. 13CBA1330

Defendants

Rolling In The Dough LLC

Cookston, Robert L, III

Heimerl, Katherine

Cookston, Andrea

Heimerl, James

Heimerl Farms Ltd.

Jonigian & Fox, Inc. dba Fox & Fox

Fox & Fox, a California Corporation

Rolling in The Dough LLC, a Connecticut limited liability company

Jonigian & Fox, Inc.

Heimerl Farms, Ltd., an Ohio limited liability Company

Cross Defendant

Jonigian & Fox, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STURMER, DEBRA S

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Wilkins, James H.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Omega Dedicated Limited; Chaucer Corporate Capital; Cookston, Robert L, III; Cookston, Andrea; Heimerl, James; Heimerl, Katherine; Jonigian & Fox, Inc.; Rolling in The Dough LLC, a Connecticut limited liability company; Heimerl Farms, Ltd., an Ohio limited liability Company; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to the Entire Action of all parties and all causes of action.)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Executed Request for Dismissa.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 7/10/17 at 1pm RM #104

Notice of Settlement filed

Pleading - Notice To Settlement of Entire Case.pdf

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address.pdf

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Pleading - executed Complaint.pdf

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Omega Dedicated Limited; Chaucer Corporate Capital; Cookston, Robert L, III; Cookston, Andrea; Heimerl, James; Heimerl, Katherine; Jonigian & Fox, Inc.; Rolling in The Dough LLC, a Connecticut limited liability company; Heimerl Farms, Ltd., an Ohio limited liability Company; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to the Entire Action of all parties and all causes of action.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Executed Request for Dismissa.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 7/10/17 at 1pm RM #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Pleading - Notice To Settlement of Entire Case.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross Complaint Filed- Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Pleading - executed Complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Financial info for Jonigian & Fox, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-00515 Jonigian & Fox, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Financial info for Jonigian & Fox, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Financial: Jonigian & Fox, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Financial info for Chaucer Corporate Capital: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54802 Chaucer Corporate Capital $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Financial info for Chaucer Corporate Capital: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Financial: Chaucer Corporate Capital; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less