This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:29:47 (UTC).

OlgaL De Olmedo vs Orlando Olmedo Tapia

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 OlgaL De Olmedo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Orlando Olmedo Tapia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6647

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

De Olmedo, Olga

Fresno, CA 93727

Respondent

Tapia, Orlando

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Document sent to- Comment: Conformed Restoration of Former Name SENT to Pro Per Box filed under "O" (rjc/flex 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Ex Order Restore Former Name- Comment: Former name OLGA LIDIA VELAZQUEZ ANGUIANO restored (rjc/flex 09/29/2014).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Document sent to- Comment: Sent to Flex with Ex Parte Application for REstorantion of Former Name After Entry of Judgment and Order. ef 9/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 02/05/2014 Scanned Date: 03/13/14 lml

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to:SCANNING/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution ___/RLV l Separation ___ Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File requested and forwarded to:RV flex for judg review. nr 02-04-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of summons on FL petn for disso marr, blk response, compltd & blk dec of discl, schedule of assets & debts, I&E dec filed showing service on Orlando O Tapia by pers service on 12/26/13. ms 12/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by HYANEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona hgy 12/16/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: hgy 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _x__ No ___ hgy 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. hgy 12/16/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _x No ___: assigned to Judge DTT hgy 12/16/13 Event: Pet Disso Mar-no child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less